Deshotel v. Nationwide Recovery Systems, Ltd.

Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Deshotel
Defendant: Nationwide Recovery Systems, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00529
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
1 Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer L. Deshotel. Nationwide Recovery Systems, Ltd. served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Sulaiman, Omar)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/17/2018. (ch, )
December 6, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
December 6, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
December 5, 2018 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Nationwide Recovery Systems, Ltd.. (klc, )
December 5, 2018 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marwan Rocco Daher on behalf of Jennifer L. Deshotel (Daher, Marwan)
December 5, 2018 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Omar Tayseer Sulaiman on behalf of Jennifer L. Deshotel (Sulaiman, Omar)
December 5, 2018 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Omar Tayseer Sulaiman on behalf of Jennifer L. Deshotel (Sulaiman, Omar)
December 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Nationwide Recovery Systems, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7050378.), filed by Jennifer L. Deshotel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sulaiman, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deshotel v. Nationwide Recovery Systems, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Deshotel
Represented By: Marwan Rocco Daher
Represented By: Omar Tayseer Sulaiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Recovery Systems, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?