Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00025
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 3/31/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Enger, Eric)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Demetrios Anaipakos on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amir H. Alavi on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP (Alavi, Amir)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyril Vladimir Talanov on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP (Talanov, Kyril)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alisa Anne Lipski on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP (Lipski, Alisa)
February 7, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 3/16/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP. Apple Inc. served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (ch, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP (Fair, Andrea)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blaine Andrew Larson on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP (Larson, Blaine)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael F Heim on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP (Heim, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Michael First on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP (First, Christopher)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP (Ward, Thomas)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP (Henry, Claire)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.. (ch, )
January 24, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
January 24, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7108907.), filed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Enger, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Eric James Enger
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Represented By: Blaine Andrew Larson
Represented By: Michael F Heim
Represented By: Christopher Michael First
Represented By: Amir H. Alavi
Represented By: Demetrios Anaipakos
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: Kyril Vladimir Talanov
Represented By: Alisa Anne Lipski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?