Hogue v. American Honda Motor et al

Plaintiff: Kristin Hogue
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. and Honda Motor Company, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00032
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Crawford-Steger on behalf of American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Crawford-Steger, Amanda)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kristin Hogue (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Counts, Andrew)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Galen Counts on behalf of Kristin Hogue (Counts, Andrew)
February 22, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Honda Motor Company, Ltd..(Kern, Kurt)
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc. CT Corporation System, Honda Motor Company, Ltd. c/o President Nobuhiko Kawamoto. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Honda Motor Company, Ltd.)(nkl, )
January 29, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
January 29, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7116416.), filed by kristin hogue. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tracy, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogue v. American Honda Motor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Crawford-Steger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Kurt Christopher Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Hogue
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Represented By: Andrew Galen Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?