Salehi v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Plaintiff: Leo Salehi
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 2:2019cv00035
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion to Change Venue. ORDERED that this case is transferred to the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/4/2019. (ch, )
February 26, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation, Corporate Parent The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company for Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Rademaekers, Iwana)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Unpublished Opinions)(Rademaekers, Iwana)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/22/2019. (ch, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (ch, )
February 1, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
February 1, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7121531.), filed by Leo Salehi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es))(Goodman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salehi v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Salehi
Represented By: Robert Edward Goodman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?