Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00048
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 5/10/2019 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/10/2019. (nkl, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Yakov (Jake) Zolotorev on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7219240. (Zolotorev, Yakov)
April 8, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Apple, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
April 8, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - please correct the civil action number on document and re-file. Document # 22, ANSWER. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
April 5, 2019 Filing 22 FILED IN ERROR ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Apple, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 4/8/2019 (nkl, ).
April 5, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Transfer This Action Pursuant To The First-To-File Rule by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Declaration of Michael Jaynes, #28 Exhibit A to Jaynes Decl., #29 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Peter Maggiore on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7213951. (Maggiore, Peter)
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Edward H Sikorski on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7213925. (Sikorski, Edward)
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Erin P Gibson on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7213903. (Gibson, Erin)
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sean C Cunningham on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7213891. (Cunningham, Sean)
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erik R Fuehrer on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Fuehrer, Erik)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mann, James)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. (Mann, James)
February 25, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 4/5/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC (Thompson, Gregory)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Milowic, III on behalf of Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7154518. (Milowic, Joseph)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ron Hagiz on behalf of Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7154490. (Hagiz, Ron)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Edward J DeFranco on behalf of Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7154473. (DeFranco, Edward)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seung Woo (Ben) Hur on behalf of Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC (Hur, Seung Woo)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gyu Shik Jang on behalf of Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC (Jang, Gyu Shik)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple, Inc..( Guaragna, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin P.B. Johnson on behalf of Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC (Johnson, Kevin)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian P Biddinger on behalf of Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC (Biddinger, Brian)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC (Mann, James)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. Apple, Inc. served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Mann, James)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc. CT Corporation System. (nkl, )
February 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
February 12, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7135876.), filed by Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mann, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Represented By: Brian P Biddinger
Represented By: Gregory Blake Thompson
Represented By: Edward J DeFranco
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Gyu Shik Jang
Represented By: Seung Woo (Ben) Hur
Represented By: Ron Hagiz
Represented By: Joseph Milowic, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Edward H Sikorski
Represented By: Yakov (Jake) Zolotorev
Represented By: John M Guaragna
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Sean C Cunningham
Represented By: Erin P Gibson
Represented By: Erik R Fuehrer
Represented By: Peter Maggiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?