Optis Wireless Technology, LLC et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC and Optis Cellular Technology, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00066
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 30 REDACTION to #26 Sealed Document by Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC. (Burgess, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File the First Amended Complaint Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/14/2019. (nkl, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC (Truelove, Jennifer)
May 14, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT VIII OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
May 13, 2019 Filing 26 Sealed Document. PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Burgess, Kevin)
May 13, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT VIII OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION Responses due by 5/14/2019. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/30/2019. (nkl, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT VIII OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC (Burgess, Kevin)
April 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mary (Mindy) V Sooter on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7241561. (Sooter, Mary (Mindy))
April 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Timothy D. Syrett on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7240604. (Syrett, Timothy)
April 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Selwyn on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7240409. (Selwyn, Mark)
April 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brittany Amadi on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7240407. (Amadi, Brittany)
April 22, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
April 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT VIII OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Selwyn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jason G Sheasby on behalf of Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7222696. (Sheasby, Jason)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Hong Annita Zhong on behalf of Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7217121. (Zhong, Hong)
April 9, 2019 NOTICE of Correction of Attorney's Last Name - Ingrid Marie Haslund Peterson corrected to Ingrid Marie Haslund Petersen. (jmv, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Elliot Z. Chen on behalf of Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7215452. (Chen, Elliot)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ingrid Marie Haslund Petersen on behalf of Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7215312. (Haslund Peterson, Ingrid) Modified on 4/9/2019 (jmv, ).
March 18, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 4/22/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly Elin Engelmann on behalf of Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC (Engelmann, Holly)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unwired Planet, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited. Apple Inc. served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (nkl, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Optis WT Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent H57 Acquisition Fund, LP, Corporate Parent H57 Acquisition, LLC, Corporate Parent Acquisition Partners, LLC for Optis Wireless Technology, LLC; Corporate Parent H57 Acquisition Fund, LP, Corporate Parent Unwired Planet IP Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent H57 Acquisition, LLC, Corporate Parent Unwired Planet IP Manager, LLC, Corporate Parent Acquisition Partners, LLC for Unwired Planet, LLC; Corporate Parent H57 Acquisition Fund, LP, Corporate Parent H57 Acquisition, LLC, Corporate Parent Acquisition Partners, LLC for Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited. (Burgess, Kevin)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christine Michelle Woodin on behalf of Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC (Woodin, Christine)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven John Pollinger on behalf of Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC (Pollinger, Steven)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theodore Stevenson, III on behalf of Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC (Stevenson, Theodore)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mike McKool on behalf of Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC (McKool, Mike)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited, Unwired Planet, LLC (Baxter, Samuel)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc. By and through its Registered Agent:C T Corp System. (nkl, )
February 26, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
February 26, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7154952.), filed by Unwired Planet, LLC, Optis Wireless Technology, LLC, PanOptis Patent Management, LLC, Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, Unwired Planet International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burgess, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Optis Wireless Technology, LLC et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unwired Planet International Limited
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: Jason G Sheasby
Represented By: Mike McKool
Represented By: Steven John Pollinger
Represented By: Holly Elin Engelmann
Represented By: Elliot Z. Chen
Represented By: Ingrid Marie Haslund Petersen
Represented By: Christine Michelle Woodin
Represented By: Hong Annita Zhong
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unwired Planet, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: Jason G Sheasby
Represented By: Mike McKool
Represented By: Steven John Pollinger
Represented By: Holly Elin Engelmann
Represented By: Elliot Z. Chen
Represented By: Ingrid Marie Haslund Petersen
Represented By: Christine Michelle Woodin
Represented By: Hong Annita Zhong
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optis Wireless Technology, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: Jason G Sheasby
Represented By: Mike McKool
Represented By: Steven John Pollinger
Represented By: Holly Elin Engelmann
Represented By: Elliot Z. Chen
Represented By: Ingrid Marie Haslund Petersen
Represented By: Christine Michelle Woodin
Represented By: Hong Annita Zhong
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PanOptis Patent Management, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: Jason G Sheasby
Represented By: Mike McKool
Represented By: Steven John Pollinger
Represented By: Holly Elin Engelmann
Represented By: Elliot Z. Chen
Represented By: Ingrid Marie Haslund Petersen
Represented By: Christine Michelle Woodin
Represented By: Hong Annita Zhong
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optis Cellular Technology, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: Jason G Sheasby
Represented By: Mike McKool
Represented By: Steven John Pollinger
Represented By: Holly Elin Engelmann
Represented By: Elliot Z. Chen
Represented By: Ingrid Marie Haslund Petersen
Represented By: Christine Michelle Woodin
Represented By: Hong Annita Zhong
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Mary (Mindy) V Sooter
Represented By: Mark D. Selwyn
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Timothy D. Syrett
Represented By: Brittany Amadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?