GREE, INC v. SUPERCELL OY
Plaintiff: GREE, INC
Defendant: SUPERCELL OY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00071
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for SUPERCELL OY to 5/16/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SUPERCELL OY.( Miller, Geoffrey)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GREE, INC. SUPERCELL OY served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Smith, Melissa)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/20/2019. (klc, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Jacqueline Pfingst on behalf of GREE, INC (Pfingst, Taylor)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Edward Mosley on behalf of GREE, INC (Mosley, William)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Edward Kolassa on behalf of GREE, INC (Kolassa, Scott)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven David Moore on behalf of GREE, INC (Moore, Steven)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of GREE, INC (Smith, Melissa)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to SUPERCELL OY. (ch, )
February 28, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
February 28, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GREE, INC (Gillam, Harry)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gillam, Harry)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUPERCELL OY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7159177.), filed by GREE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillam, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREE, INC v. SUPERCELL OY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREE, INC
Represented By: Steven David Moore
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Scott Edward Kolassa
Represented By: William Edward Mosley
Represented By: Taylor Jacqueline Pfingst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERCELL OY
Represented By: Geoffrey Robert Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?