Lebrun v. Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Gregory Lebrun
Defendant: Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00078
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Responses due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/28/2019. (nkl, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Gregory Lebrun. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss)(Winocour, Jonathan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Elmore Declaration, #2 Exhibit Wright Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wickes, Paul)
March 28, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Kansas City Southern Railway Company to 4/12/2019. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kansas City Southern Railway Company.( Wickes, Paul)
March 28, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE USE THE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION Document # 5, Unopposed Application for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kansas City Southern Railway Company.( Wickes, Paul) Modified on 3/28/2019 (ch, ).
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Lebrun. Kansas City Southern Railway Company served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Winocour, Jonathan)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Kansas City Southern Railway Company by and through its registered agent for service of process in Texas: CT Corporation System. (nkl, )
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/20/2019. (klc, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (nkl, )
March 5, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
March 5, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Plaintiff's Original) against Kansas City Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7166303.), filed by Gregory Lebrun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es) Summons in a Civil Action)(Winocour, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2019: #3 Revised Civil Cover Sheet) (nkl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lebrun v. Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lebrun
Represented By: Jonathan Francis Winocour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Paul O Wickes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?