LEAM Drilling Systems, LLC et al v. C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc. DO NOT DOCKET. Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Texas - Marshall Division).
Plaintiff: LEAM Drilling Systems, LLC, Conroe Machine, LLC and REME, LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00079
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00411. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 7, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Texas - Marshall Division. Case transferred electronically, filed. (sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Granting #2 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Declaratory Judgment Claims and to Transfer. CLR's request for declaratory judgment is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. C&J's motion to transfer is GRANTED. The court declines to rule on CLR's motion to sever and remand. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Texas, Marshall Division. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Conroe Machine, LLC, LEAM Drilling Systems, LLC, REME, LLC, filed.(Zeve, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc., filed.(Mensing, Todd) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY in Support of #2 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Declaratory Judgment Claims and to Transfer, filed by C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Mensing, Todd) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with JURY DEMAND by Conroe Machine, LLC, LEAM Drilling Systems, LLC, REME, LLC, filed.(Zeve, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 SEALED EXHIBITS 7-10 & 12 re: #17 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Conroe Machine, LLC, LEAM Drilling Systems, LLC, REME, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 - Expert Witness Designation, #2 Exhibit 8 - Mendez Depo Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 9 - Supp Expert Witness Designation, #4 Exhibit 10 - Original Motion to Exclude Mendez, #5 Exhibit 12 - Amended Motion to Exclude Mendez) (Zeve, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 17 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Conroe Machine, LLC, LEAM Drilling Systems, LLC, REME, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EDTX Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - C&J Answer and Counterclaims, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mtn to Dismiss and Mtn to Transfer, #5 Exhibit 5 - Tellus Original Petition, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Non-Suit, #7 Exhibit 7 - Expert Witness Designation, #8 Exhibit 8 - Mendez Depo Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 9 - Supp Expert Witness Designation, #10 Exhibit 10 - Original Motion to Exclude Mendez, #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts from Hearing on Renewed MTC, #12 Exhibit 12 - Amended Motion to Exclude Mendez, #13 Exhibit 12 - Amended Motion to Exclude Mendez, #14 Exhibit 14 - Order Granting Continuance, #15 Exhibit 15 - Order Denying Request to Supplement, #16 Exhibit 16 - Order Partially Granting Mtn. to Exclude Kirby, #17 Exhibit 17 - Original Petition for Dec Judgment, #18 Exhibit 18 - Amended EDTX Complaint, #19 Exhibit 19 - Plaintiff Motion for Expedited Trial Setting, #20 Exhibit 20 - Copyright Registrations, #21 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Sever and Remand)(Zeve, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits 7-10 & 12 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Sever and Remand by Conroe Machine, LLC, LEAM Drilling Systems, LLC, REME, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Under Seal)(Zeve, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED EXHIBITS 4-6, 8, & 13 re: #14 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Conroe Machine, LLC, LEAM Drilling Systems, LLC, REME, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 - Expert Witness Designation, #2 Exhibit 5 - Amended Motion to Exclude Mendez, #3 Exhibit 6 - Motion to Exclude R Kirby, #4 Exhibit 8 - Supp Expert Witness Designation, #5 Exhibit 13 - Location of Witnesses) (Zeve, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Declaratory Judgment Claims and to Transfer, filed by Conroe Machine, LLC, LEAM Drilling Systems, LLC, REME, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EDTX Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - C&J Answer and Counterclaims, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Expert Witness Designation, #5 Exhibit 5 - Amended Motion to Exclude Mendez, #6 Exhibit 6 - Motion to Exclude R Kirby, #7 Exhibit 7 - Order Granting Mtn. to Exclude Mendez, #8 Exhibit 8 - Supp Expert Witness Designation, #9 Exhibit 9 - Order Denying Request to Supplement, #10 Exhibit 10 - Order Partially Granting Mtn. to Exclude Kirby, #11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Non-Suit, #12 Exhibit 12 - Original Petition for Dec Judgment, #13 Exhibit 13 - Location of Witnesses, #14 Exhibit 14 - C&J RFD Response, #15 Exhibit 15 - Houston, TX to Marshall, TX, #16 Exhibit 16 - Conroe, TX to Marshall, TX, #17 Exhibit 17 - Filing to Disposition Statistics, #18 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss & Motion to Transfer)(Zeve, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits 4-6, 8, & 13 in Support of Plaintiffs' Response by Conroe Machine, LLC, LEAM Drilling Systems, LLC, REME, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Under Seal)(Zeve, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #11 Order for Initial Conference - FORM - Miller by C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc., filed.(Mensing, Todd) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 3/29/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #9 Certificate of Conference, #2 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Declaratory Judgment Claims and to Transfer by C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc., filed.(Mensing, Todd) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #2 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Declaratory Judgment Claims and to Transfer by C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc., filed.(Mensing, Todd) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER re: #2 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Declaratory Judgment Claims and to Transfer, filed.(Mensing, Todd) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Register of Copyrights, AO-121, Notified. (SarahShelbyadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane Robinson on behalf of C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc., filed. (Robinson, Jane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sammy Ford on behalf of C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc., filed. (Ford, Sammy) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Weining Bai on behalf of C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc., filed. (Bai, Weining) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Amir Alavi on behalf of C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc., filed. (Alavi, Amir) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Declaratory Judgment Claims and to Transfer by C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Mensing, Todd) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21813993) filed by C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mensing, Todd) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEAM Drilling Systems, LLC et al v. C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc. DO NOT DOCKET. Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Texas - Marshall Division).
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAM Drilling Systems, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer A Little
Represented By: Andrew William Zeve
Represented By: Christopher Lee Dodson
Represented By: Ryan Bradley McBeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conroe Machine, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer A Little
Represented By: Andrew William Zeve
Represented By: Christopher Lee Dodson
Represented By: Ryan Bradley McBeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REME, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer A Little
Represented By: Andrew William Zeve
Represented By: Christopher Lee Dodson
Represented By: Ryan Bradley McBeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: C&J Spec Rent Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amir H. Alavi
Represented By: Todd W Mensing
Represented By: Weining Bai
Represented By: Sammy Ford, IV
Represented By: Jane Langdell Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?