Personalized Media Communications, LLC v. Google LLC

Plaintiff: Personalized Media Communications, LLC
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00090
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tamar Elizabeth Lusztig on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Lusztig, Tamar)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. Google LLC served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Grinstein, Joseph)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arun S Subramanian on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Subramanian, Arun)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrey Belenky on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Belenky, Andrey)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dmitry Kheyfits on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Kheyfits, Dmitry)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Google LLC c/o Corporation Service Company. (nkl, )
March 21, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
March 21, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Grinstein, Joseph)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Capshaw, Sidney)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Capshaw, Sidney)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7190526.), filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit B Part 1, #4 Exhibit B Part 2, #5 Exhibit C Part 1, #6 Exhibit C Part 2, #7 Exhibit D Part 1, #8 Exhibit D Part 2, #9 Exhibit E Part 1, #10 Exhibit E Part 2, #11 Exhibit F Part 1, #12 Exhibit F Part 2, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Capshaw, Sidney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Personalized Media Communications, LLC v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Personalized Media Communications, LLC
Represented By: Dmitry Kheyfits
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Grinstein
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Arun S Subramanian
Represented By: Tamar Elizabeth Lusztig
Represented By: Andrey Belenky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?