Red Rock Analytics, LLC v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Red Rock Analytics, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Hon. Layn R Phillips (Ret.)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00117
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 77 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, )
February 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #75 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that Red Rocks claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/8/2020. (ch, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 75 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Alden)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Motion to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. ORDERED that all proceedings and deadlines in the above-captioned case be STAYED until February 20, 2020. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/21/2020. (ch, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 73 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Alden)
January 7, 2020 Filing 72 Red Rock Analytics, LLC's ANSWER to #71 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Red Rock Analytics, LLC.(Harris, Alden)
December 30, 2019 Filing 71 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Red Rock Analytics, LLC by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 70 P.R. 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Harris, Alden)
December 3, 2019 Filing 69 REDACTION to #68 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alden Harris, #2 Exhibit M)(Harris, Alden)
December 3, 2019 Filing 68 SEALED SUR-REPLY in Opposition to #53 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alden Harris, #2 Exhibit M)(Harris, Alden)
November 22, 2019 Filing 67 REDACTION to #66 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
November 22, 2019 Filing 66 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #53 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
November 21, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. Regarding P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
November 21, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Red Rock Analytics, LLC re P.R. 4-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 18, 2019 Filing 63 REDACTION to #62 Sealed Response to Motion, by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth DeRieux, #3 Declaration of Alden Harris, #4 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L)(Harris, Alden)
November 15, 2019 Filing 62 SEALED RESPONSE to #53 Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth DeRieux, #3 Declaration of Alden Harris, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L)(Harris, Alden)
November 4, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Regarding Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction (Smith, Melissa)
November 4, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Red Rock Analytics, LLC re P.R. 4-1 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying #31 Motion to Refer Case to Judge Payne for Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/23/2019. (ch, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #54 Redacted Document,,,, NOTICE OF CORRECTED EXHIBIT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18b)(Smith, Melissa)
October 21, 2019 Filing 57 SEALED NOTICE OF CORRECTED EXHIBITS TO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) [DKT 53]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 18b)(Smith, Melissa)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Joint MOTION Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer re 53 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/9/2019. (ch, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 55 Joint MOTION Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer re #53 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Alden)
October 1, 2019 Filing 54 REDACTION to #53 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Moss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 4a, #7 Exhibit 4b, #8 Exhibit 4c, #9 Exhibit 4d, #10 Exhibit 4e, #11 Exhibit 4f, #12 Exhibit 5, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 10, #18 Exhibit 11, #19 Exhibit 12, #20 Exhibit 12a, #21 Exhibit 12b, #22 Exhibit 13, #23 Exhibit 14, #24 Exhibit 15, #25 Exhibit 16, #26 Exhibit 16a, #27 Exhibit 16b, #28 Exhibit 17, #29 Exhibit 18, #30 Exhibit 18a, #31 Exhibit 18b, #32 Exhibit 19, #33 Exhibit 20, #34 Exhibit 21, #35 Exhibit 22, #36 Exhibit 23, #37 Exhibit 24, #38 Exhibit 24a, #39 Exhibit 25, #40 Exhibit 26, #41 Exhibit 27, #42 Exhibit 28, #43 Exhibit 29, #44 Exhibit 29a, #45 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 25, 2019 Filing 53 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Moss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 4a, #7 Exhibit 4b, #8 Exhibit 4c, #9 Exhibit 4d, #10 Exhibit 4e, #11 Exhibit 4f, #12 Exhibit 5, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 10, #18 Exhibit 11, #19 Exhibit 12, #20 Exhibit 12a, #21 Exhibit 12b, #22 Exhibit 13, #23 Exhibit 14, #24 Exhibit 15, #25 Exhibit 16, #26 Exhibit 16a, #27 Exhibit 16b, #28 Exhibit 17, #29 Exhibit 18, #30 Exhibit 18a, #31 Exhibit 18b, #32 Exhibit 19, #33 Exhibit 20, #34 Exhibit 21, #35 Exhibit 22, #36 Exhibit 23, #37 Exhibit 24, #38 Exhibit 24a, #39 Exhibit 25, #40 Exhibit 26, #41 Exhibit 27, #42 Exhibit 28, #43 Exhibit 29, #44 Exhibit 29a, #45 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 19, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. Regarding PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Smith, Melissa)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER #50 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/7/2019. (ch, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Protective Order by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Agreed Protective Order)(Harris, Alden)
July 25, 2019 Filing 49 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Refer Case to Judge Payne for Pretrial Proceedings filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
July 25, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 48,. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (klc, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 48 **FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE** SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Refer Case to Judge Payne for Pretrial Proceedings filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 7/25/2019 (klc, ).
July 23, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Red Rock Analytics, LLC re Initial and Additional Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 45, NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 45 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 7/23/2019 (nkl, ).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Deadline extended to 7/29/2019. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/2019. (ch, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Refer Case to Judge Payne for Pretrial Proceedings filed by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Harris, Alden)
July 18, 2019 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/17/19. (ch, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Refer Case to Judge Payne for Pretrial Proceedings filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #34 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2019., Jury Selection set for 9/14/2020 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 4/13/2020., Markman Hearing set for 3/16/2020 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 7/24/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/3/2020. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/12/2019. (ch, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY granting #36 Joint MOTION for Entry of E-Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/12/2019. (ch, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AGREED DISCOVERY ORDER granting #35 Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/12/2019. (ch, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Entry of E-Discovery Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Layn Phillips, Phillips ADR, 2101 East Coast Highway, Suite 250, Corona Del Mar, California 92625, telephone number 949-760-5288, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/8/19. (ch, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Red Rock Analytics, LLC.(Harris, Alden)
July 3, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Refer Case to Judge Payne for Pretrial Proceedings by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
July 3, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Honorable Layn R. Phillips, filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
July 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 7/1/2019. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml)
June 20, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Musher on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7319554. (Musher, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2019: #1 Sealed Attachment) (jmv, ).
June 20, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ariane Salone Moss on behalf of Apple Inc. (Moss, Ariane)
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kent Thomas Dallow on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7319366. (Dallow, Kent)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Shaw Young on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7319341. (Young, Daniel)
June 18, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Red Rock Analytics, LLC re P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 17, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Ferguson, Brian)
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Apple Inc.. (Ferguson, Brian)
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Apple Inc. by Apple Inc..(Ferguson, Brian)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Stephen Magee on behalf of Apple Inc. (Magee, Robert)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anne Marie Cappella on behalf of Apple Inc. (Cappella, Anne)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian E Ferguson on behalf of Apple Inc. (Ferguson, Brian)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2019 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap (nkl, )
April 29, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 6/17/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
April 29, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 6/2/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Red Rock Analytics, LLC Notice of Final Judgment by Judge Payne in Related Proceeding Involving Same Patent (Harris, Alden)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. Apple Inc. served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Harris, Alden)
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Boone Baxter on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Baxter, James)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Miranda Yan Jones on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Jones, Miranda)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael F Heim on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Heim, Michael)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alden Harris on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Harris, Alden)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Allan Bullwinkel on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Bullwinkel, Robert)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Capshaw, Sidney)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Henry, Claire)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Ward, Thomas)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc. c/o CT Corporation System. (nkl, )
April 11, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (klc, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Payne, Leslie)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7222802.), filed by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US 7,346,313, #2 Exhibit B - Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit C - Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Payne, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Rock Analytics, LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Shaw Young
Represented By: Brian E Ferguson
Represented By: Daniel Musher
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Ariane Salone Moss
Represented By: Kent Thomas Dallow
Represented By: Robert Stephen Magee
Represented By: Anne Marie Cappella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Rock Analytics, LLC
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Leslie V Payne
Represented By: James Boone Baxter
Represented By: Miranda Yan Jones
Represented By: Robert Allan Bullwinkel
Represented By: Michael F Heim
Represented By: Alden Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Hon. Layn R Phillips (Ret.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?