Quest Nettech Corporation v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Quest Nettech Corporation
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Jay Gandhi
Case Number: 2:2019cv00118
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 59 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Quest Nettech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Constructions Chart)(Fabricant, Alfred)
December 17, 2019 Filing 58 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Jensen, Travis)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 E-DISCOVERY ORDER re #56 Motion for Entry of Agreed E-Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/12/2019. (nkl, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed E-Discovery Order by Quest Nettech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed E-Discovery Order)(Fabricant, Alfred)
December 3, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Quest Nettech Corporation Regarding Service of its 4-2 Disclosures (Fabricant, Alfred)
December 3, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. Regarding P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/27/2019. (ch, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. Regarding PR 4-1 Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE by Quest Nettech Corporation of Compliance with service of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Fabricant, Alfred)
October 17, 2019 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), #20 MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. Regarding PR 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying as moot #39 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/27/19. (ch, )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/20/2019. (nkl, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 46 Joint MOTION For Entry of Opposed Protective Order by Quest Nettech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NetTech proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Apple proposed Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C - Redline showing the difference between the two proposals)(Fabricant, Alfred)
August 16, 2019 Filing 45 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Quest Nettech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vincent J. Rubino, III, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14)(Fabricant, Alfred)
August 14, 2019 Filing 44 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Quest Nettech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alfred R. Fabricant, #2 Exhibit 1 - US Patent No. 9,864,984)(Fabricant, Alfred)
August 9, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl. M. Jaynes, #2 Affidavit Supp. Decl. T. Jensen, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 11)(Jensen, Travis)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #30 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Opposed Docket Control Order filed by Quest Nettech Corporation. Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2019., Jury Selection set for 9/14/2020 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 4/13/2020., Markman Hearing set for 3/16/2020 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in Limine due by 7/20/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/3/2020. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/8/2019. (nkl, )
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 DISCOVERY ORDER granting #31 Motion for Entry of Opposed Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/7/2019. (nkl, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff to File Sur-Reply in Further Response in Opposition. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/3/2019. (nkl, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jensen, Travis)
August 1, 2019 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION To Extend Deadline For Plaintiff to File Sur-Reply re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Quest Nettech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambrianakos, Peter)
August 1, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Jensen, Travis)
July 22, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by Quest Nettech Corporation of Compliance Regarding Service of Initial and Additional Disclosures (Fabricant, Alfred)
July 22, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/2019. (nkl, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Quest Nettech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Jon C. Scahill, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Vincent J. Rubino, III, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7)(Fabricant, Alfred)
July 18, 2019 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frost, Claudia)
July 16, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTY Document # 29, Opposed Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 31 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Opposed Discovery Order by Quest Nettech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Proposed Discovery Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Proposed Discovery Order)(Lambrianakos, Peter)
July 15, 2019 Filing 30 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Opposed Docket Control Order by Quest Nettech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Proposed Docket Control Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Proposed Docket Control Order)(Lambrianakos, Peter)
July 15, 2019 Filing 29 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTY***Opposed MOTION for Entry of Opposed Discovery Order by Quest Nettech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Proposed Discovery Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Proposed Discovery Order)(Fabricant, Alfred) Modified on 7/16/2019 (ch, ).
July 15, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Quest Nettech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fabricant, Alfred)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. Jay C. Gandhi is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/8/2019. (nkl, )
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Dkt. 19) and to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Dkt. 20). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/3/2019. (nkl, )
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Letter Pursuant to the Courts Standing Order regarding motions under 35 U.S.C. 101. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/3/2019. (nkl, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 24 CONSENT to Mediation by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frost, Claudia)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Joint Letter Regarding Motions Under 35 U.S.C. 101 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 Agreed MOTION to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Dkt. 19) and to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Dkt. 20 by Quest Nettech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fabricant, Alfred)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Letter Pursuant to the Courts Standing Order regarding motions under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 7/1/2019. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml)
June 20, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Jaynes ISO Motion, #2 Declaration of Travis Jensen ISO Motion, #3 Ex. 1 to Decl. of Travis Jensen, #4 Ex. 2 to Decl. of Travis Jensen, #5 Ex. 3 to Decl. of Travis Jensen, #6 Ex. 4 to Decl. of Travis Jensen, #7 Ex. 5 to Decl. of Travis Jensen, #8 Ex. 6 to Decl. of Travis Jensen, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Jensen, Travis)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Travis Jensen in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Travis Jensen, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Travis Jensen, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jensen, Travis)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Kurt Truelove on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Truelove, Justin)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2019 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/5/2019. (nkl, )
May 17, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 6/20/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple, Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler Scott Miller on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Miller, Tyler)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Jensen on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Jensen, Travis)
May 1, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 6/5/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple, Inc. (Frost, Claudia)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quest Nettech Corporation. Apple, Inc. served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Fabricant, Alfred)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Quest Nettech Corporation (Lambrianakos, Peter)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Quest Nettech Corporation (Rubino, Vincent)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Chester Drucker on behalf of Quest Nettech Corporation (Drucker, Lawrence)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Quest Nettech Corporation (Fabricant, Alfred)
April 12, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #5 Amended Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Amended Complaint)(Fabricant, Alfred)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc., filed by Quest Nettech Corporation.(Fabricant, Alfred)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc. c/o CT Corporation System. (nkl, )
April 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quest Nettech Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Quest Patent Research Corporation for Quest Nettech Corporation. (Fabricant, Alfred)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fabricant, Alfred)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7224015.), filed by Quest Nettech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabricant, Alfred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quest Nettech Corporation v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Tyler Scott Miller
Represented By: Claudia Wilson Frost
Represented By: Travis Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quest Nettech Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence Chester Drucker
Represented By: Alfred Ross Fabricant
Represented By: Vincent J Rubino, III
Represented By: Justin Kurt Truelove
Represented By: Peter Lambrianakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Jay Gandhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?