Bass v. CHRISTUS Good Shepherd Medical Center - Longview et al

Plaintiff: Gary Bass
Defendant: CHRISTUS Good Shepherd Medical Center - Longview, MD O.J. Chastain, MD Rodney Slone, MD John Colquitt, MD Shahab Akvan and MD Jonathan Greifenkamp
Case Number: 2:2019cv00177
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary Bass. Jonathan Greifenkamp waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Erskine, Blake)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary Bass. O.J. Chastain waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Erskine, Blake)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary Bass. Shahab Akvan waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Erskine, Blake)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary Bass. Rodney Slone waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Erskine, Blake)
May 30, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
May 22, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 4, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chad F Newman on behalf of Gary Bass (Newman, Chad)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blake Charles Erskine on behalf of Gary Bass (Erskine, Blake)
May 15, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
May 15, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Original Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7269651.), filed by Gary Bass. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Erskine, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bass v. CHRISTUS Good Shepherd Medical Center - Longview et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTUS Good Shepherd Medical Center - Longview
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD O.J. Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Rodney Slone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD John Colquitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Shahab Akvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Jonathan Greifenkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bass
Represented By: Blake Charles Erskine, Jr
Represented By: Blake Charles Erskine
Represented By: Chad F Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?