Walker v. LVNV Funding LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Walker
Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00227
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LVNV Funding LLC (Jones, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by LVNV Funding LLC.(Jones, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement FRCP 7.1 Disclosure)(Hughes, Alexander)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Walker. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Reg. Agent: CT Corporation System. (nkl, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to LVNV Funding LLC Reg. Agent CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company. (nkl, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to LVNV Funding LLC, RA: Corporation Service Company. (nkl, )
June 18, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (klc, )
June 14, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
June 14, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7311390.), filed by Stephen Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Motil, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. LVNV Funding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Walker
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Motil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC
Represented By: Michael Lamar Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Giomi Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?