Cellular Evolution LLC v. AT&T Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cellular Evolution LLC
Defendant: AT&T Inc., AT&T Communications, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC and Cricket Wireless LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00228
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Notice (Other) filed by Cellular Evolution LLC, AT&T Communications, LLC and AT&T Inc. terminated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/29/2019. (nkl, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Louis Liao on behalf of Cellular Evolution LLC (Liao, Louis)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Cellular Evolution LLC Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice of AT&T Inc. and AT&T Communications, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anjom, Masood)
July 25, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 7, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Masood Anjom on behalf of Cellular Evolution LLC (Anjom, Masood)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amir H. Alavi on behalf of Cellular Evolution LLC (Alavi, Amir)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY NOTICE by Cellular Evolution LLC Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice of AT&T Inc. and AT&T Communications, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alavi, Amir) Modified on 7/25/2019 (nkl, ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cellular Evolution LLC. Cricket Wireless LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Alavi, Amir)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cellular Evolution LLC. AT&T Mobility LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Alavi, Amir)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cellular Evolution LLC.(Alavi, Amir)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Communications, LLC, AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(ch, )
June 14, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
June 14, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Alavi, Amir)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7311505.), filed by Cellular Evolution LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alavi, Amir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cellular Evolution LLC v. AT&T Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cricket Wireless LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellular Evolution LLC
Represented By: Amir H. Alavi
Represented By: Louis Liao
Represented By: Masood Anjom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?