Sgromo v. Scott et al
Plaintiff: Pietro Pasquale Antonio Sgromo, Peter Anthony Sgromo and Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo
Defendant: Leonard Gregory Scott and Eureka Inventions LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00231
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Transfer to N.D. Cal. filed by Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DECL #1 OF PPASGROMO, #2 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 1 - LTA, #3 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 2 - INVEST IN ERKA, #4 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 3 - SGROMO CONSULT FOR SCOTT, #5 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 4 - SGROMO PRE SALARY, #6 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 5 - SCOTT SGRO INVEST DISC, #7 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 6 - WEM BSTWY 440 DEAL MEMO, #8 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 7 - BSTWY ERKA 440 AGMNT, #9 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 8 - BSTWY ERKA SLIDE AGMNT)(Sgromo, Pietro)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Transfer to N.D. Cal. filed by Leonard Gregory Scott, #9 Stipulation filed by Leonard Gregory Scott. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/26/2019. (ch, ) (order sent regular mail)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Transfer to N.D. Cal. and Order to Extend Due Date of Response by Leonard Gregory Scott. (Moore, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Transfer to N.D. Cal. by Leonard Gregory Scott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Moore Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Moore Decl, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Moore Decl, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Moore Decl, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Thomas)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/8/2019. (ch, )
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER assigning case to Judge Payne by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/3/2019. (ch, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Eureka Inventions LLC, Leonard Gregory Scott, Pietro Pasquale Antonio Sgromo. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Thomas E. Moore, III on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7335834. (Moore, Thomas)
June 20, 2019 (MAILED TO PLAINTIFF REGULAR MAIL) In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) Modified on 6/20/2019 (ch, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pietro Pasquale Antonio Sgromo. (ch, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pietro Pasquale Antonio Sgromo from Superior Court of the State of California, case number CPF - 19-516663., filed by Pietro Pasquale Antonio Sgromo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit A-D)(ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ch, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sgromo v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pietro Pasquale Antonio Sgromo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Anthony Sgromo
Represented By: Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo
Represented By: Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Gregory Scott
Represented By: Thomas E. Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eureka Inventions LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?