GREE, INC. v. SUPERCELL OY
Plaintiff: GREE, INC.
Defendant: SUPERCELL OY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00237
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for SUPERCELL OY to 9/12/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SUPERCELL OY.( Miller, Geoffrey)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C Alemanni on behalf of GREE, INC. (Alemanni, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Higgins Ludlam on behalf of GREE, INC. (Ludlam, Taylor)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Scott Edward Kolassa terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/26/2019. (ch, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Scott Kolassa by GREE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 12, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for SUPERCELL OY to 8/28/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SUPERCELL OY.( Miller, Geoffrey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher L. Larson on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Larson, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Andrea Martinez Kaempf on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Kaempf, Jessica)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey Robert Miller on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Miller, Geoffrey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Alexander Kohm on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Kohm, Bryan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Sacksteder, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to SUPERCELL OY. (nkl, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SUPERCELL OY, filed by GREE, INC..(Smith, Melissa)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Jacqueline Pfingst on behalf of GREE, INC. (Pfingst, Taylor)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Norris Power Boothe on behalf of GREE, INC. (Boothe, Norris)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven David Moore on behalf of GREE, INC. (Moore, Steven)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Edward Kolassa on behalf of GREE, INC. (Kolassa, Scott)
June 25, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/25/2019. (nkl, )
June 25, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GREE, INC. (Smith, Melissa)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUPERCELL OY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7323492.), filed by GREE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREE, INC. v. SUPERCELL OY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERCELL OY
Represented By: Jessica Andrea Martinez Kaempf
Represented By: Christopher L. Larson
Represented By: Michael J Sacksteder
Represented By: Bryan Alexander Kohm
Represented By: Geoffrey Robert Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREE, INC.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Steven David Moore
Represented By: Scott Edward Kolassa
Represented By: Taylor Jacqueline Pfingst
Represented By: John C Alemanni
Represented By: Taylor Higgins Ludlam
Represented By: Norris Power Boothe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?