Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Panasonic Corporation of North America
Plaintiff: Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00241
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Panasonic Corporation of North America to 9/18/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dallas William Tharpe on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America (Tharpe, Dallas)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2019 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/20/2019. (ch, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph M Casino on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7380433. (Casino, Joseph)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael J Kasdan on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7380417. (Kasdan, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Panasonic Corporation of North America to 9/3/2019. (ch, )
July 30, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Panasonic Corporation of North America to 9/3/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) Modified on 7/30/2019 (ch, ).
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/18/19. (ch, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Panasonic Corporation of North America. (ch, )
July 5, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 5, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Main Document 3 replaced with flattened image on 7/5/2019) (ch, ). Modified on 7/5/2019 (ch, ).
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened image on 7/5/2019) (ch, ). Modified on 7/5/2019 (ch, ).
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Panasonic Corporation of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7337158.), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Panasonic Corporation of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Represented By: Dallas William Tharpe
Represented By: Michael J Kasdan
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Represented By: Joseph M Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Isaac Phillip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?