Infernal Technology, LLC v. Sony Interactive Entertainment America, LLC
Plaintiff: Infernal Technology, LLC and Terminal Reality, Inc.
Defendant: Sony Interactive Entertainment America, LLC and Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00248
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2019 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/20/2019. (ch, )
August 19, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC to 9/26/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC.( Smith, Melissa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc.. Sony Interactive Entertainment America, LLC served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Buether, Eric)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc.. Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Buether, Eric)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Blake William Buether terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/31/2019. (ch, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Blake W. Buether by Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buether, Blake)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC c/o Corporation Service Company d/b/a CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service. (nkl, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Interactive Entertainment America, LLC c/o Corporation Service Company d/b/a CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service. (nkl, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Clayton Pomeroy on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc. (Pomeroy, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blake William Buether on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc. (Buether, Blake)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Ricketts on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc. (Ricketts, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niky R. Bagley on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc. (Bagley, Niky)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth Paul Kula on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc. (Kula, Kenneth)
July 11, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
July 11, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Carpenter on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC (Carpenter, Brian)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Michael Joe on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC (Joe, Christopher)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Buether, Eric)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Infernal Technology, LLC (Buether, Eric)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Sony Interactive Entertainment America, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7345486.), filed by Infernal Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Buether, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infernal Technology, LLC v. Sony Interactive Entertainment America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Interactive Entertainment America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infernal Technology, LLC
Represented By: Eric William Buether
Represented By: Brian Andrew Carpenter
Represented By: Michael David Ricketts
Represented By: Michael Clayton Pomeroy
Represented By: Blake William Buether
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Kula
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joe
Represented By: Niky R. Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terminal Reality, Inc.
Represented By: Eric William Buether
Represented By: Brian Andrew Carpenter
Represented By: Michael David Ricketts
Represented By: Michael Clayton Pomeroy
Represented By: Blake William Buether
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Kula
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joe
Represented By: Niky R. Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?