Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Plaintiff: Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00250
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by George C. Lombardi on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7408576. (Lombardi, George)
August 26, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
August 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC as to Bank of America, N.A. (Hansley, Austin)
August 25, 2019 Filing 11 Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC's ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Bank of America, N.A. by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC.(Hansley, Austin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Edwards, Dustin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A..(Edwards, Dustin)
August 21, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. (Hansley, Austin)
August 1, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. to 8/23/2019. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC.( Hansley, Austin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Hansley, Austin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (nkl, )
July 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
July 12, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. (Hansley, Austin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC (Hansley, Austin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original against BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7346918.), filed by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansley, Austin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: Dustin James Edwards
Represented By: George C. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC
Represented By: Austin Lee Hansley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?