M-Red Inc. v. Panasonic Corporation et al
Plaintiff: M-Red Inc.
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation and Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00251
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Daniel Ostling on behalf of M-Red Inc. (Ostling, Jacob)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James P Gagen on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc. (Gagen, James)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shamita D Etienne-Cummings on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc. (Etienne-Cummings, Shamita)
September 6, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc. to 9/24/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc..( Satchwell, Matthew)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2019 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/20/2019. (ch, )
August 5, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc. to 9/9/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re M-Red Inc..( Rubino, Vincent)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dawn Michelle Jenkins on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc. (Jenkins, Dawn)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D. Satchwell on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc. (Satchwell, Matthew)
August 5, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 9 and 11, Notice of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dawn Michelle Jenkins on behalf of Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc. (Jenkins, Dawn) Modified on 8/5/2019 (ch, ).
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M-Red Inc.. Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Fabricant, Alfred)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D. Satchwell on behalf of Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc. (Satchwell, Matthew) Modified on 8/5/2019 (ch, ).
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Panasonic Corporation)(nkl, )
July 17, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
July 17, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Andrew Rubino on behalf of M-Red Inc. (Rubino, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of M-Red Inc. (Rubino, Vincent)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of M-Red Inc. (Lambrianakos, Peter)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of M-Red Inc. (Fabricant, Alfred)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by M-Red Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Quest Patent Research Corporation for M-Red Inc.. (Fabricant, Alfred)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fabricant, Alfred)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7352311.), filed by M-Red Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabricant, Alfred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M-Red Inc. v. Panasonic Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M-Red Inc.
Represented By: Alfred Ross Fabricant
Represented By: John Andrew Rubino
Represented By: Peter Lambrianakos
Represented By: Vincent J Rubino, III
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Ostling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America, Inc.
Represented By: James P Gagen
Represented By: Dawn Michelle Jenkins
Represented By: Shamita D Etienne-Cummings
Represented By: Matthew D. Satchwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?