GREENE v. ZIMMER, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ALVIN GREENE
Defendant: ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC., ZIMMER ORTHOPAEDIC SURGICAL PRODUCTS, INC. and ZIMMER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00305
Filed: September 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Dismiss. Case DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/22/2019. (ch, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by ALVIN GREENE. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Stroup, Danny)
October 17, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALVIN GREENE. All Defendants. (Stroup, Danny)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALVIN GREENE. All Defendants. (Stroup, Danny)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALVIN GREENE. All Defendants. (Stroup, Danny)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC., ZIMMER ORTHOPAEDIC SURGICAL PRODUCTS, INC., ZIMMER, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Zimmer Inc. for ZIMMER ORTHOPAEDIC SURGICAL PRODUCTS, INC.; Corporate Parent Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. for ZIMMER, INC.. (Lett, Katherine)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC., ZIMMER ORTHOPAEDIC SURGICAL PRODUCTS, INC., ZIMMER, INC..(Lett, Katherine)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC., ZIMMER ORTHOPAEDIC SURGICAL PRODUCTS, INC., ZIMMER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(ch, )
September 9, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
September 9, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Merle Stroup on behalf of ALVIN GREENE (Stroup, Danny)
September 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ORIGINAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7427063.), filed by ALVIN GREENE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erskine, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENE v. ZIMMER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER ORTHOPAEDIC SURGICAL PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALVIN GREENE
Represented By: Blake Charles Erskine
Represented By: Danny Merle Stroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?