Houston v. Paschall Truck Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald Houston
Defendant: Paschall Truck Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00306
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Donald Houston Certificate of Interested Parties (Hommel, William)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2019 01:50 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/30/2019. (nkl, )
October 25, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Paschall Truck Lines, Inc..(Lowell, Allyn)
October 17, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Houston. to PASCHALL TRUCK LINES, INC. by delivery to its Registered Agent, David A. Gibbs (ch, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Houston. Paschall Truck Lines, Inc. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (mjc, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Paschall Truck Lines, Inc. REGISTERED AGENT - CT CORPORATION SYSTEM. (nkl, )
September 10, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
September 10, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paschall Truck Lines, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7430325.), filed by Donald Houston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hommel, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. Paschall Truck Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paschall Truck Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Allyn J. Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Houston
Represented By: William S Hommel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?