Jones Jr. v. SkooIiepalooza.com et al
Plaintiff: Robert L. Jones Jr.
Defendant: Nick J. West, Russell D. Bishop, Skooliepalooza LLC and SkooIiepalooza.com
Case Number: 2:2019cv00399
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 Defendants Russell Bishop, Nick West and skooliepalooza.com et al ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Russell D. Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G2, #2 Envelope(s))(ch, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Russell D. Bishop, SkooIiepalooza.com, Skooliepalooza LLC, Nick J. West (ch, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 Request by Robert L. Jones Jr. for Clerk's Entry of Default against Russell D. Bishop, SkooIiepalooza.com, Skooliepalooza LLC, Nick J. West. (ch, )
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/8/2020. (ch, ) Modified on 1/15/2020 (ch, ).
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Robert L. Jones Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ch, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Jones Jr.. SkooIiepalooza.com served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (ch, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Jones Jr.. Skooliepalooza LLC served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (ch, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Jones Jr.. Russell D. Bishop served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (ch, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Jones Jr.. Nick J. West served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (ch, )
December 9, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number TXE100019778 (aam, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Russell D. Bishop, SkooIiepalooza.com, Skooliepalooza LLC, Nick J. West. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(nkl, )
December 9, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
December 9, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert L. Jones Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones Jr. v. SkooIiepalooza.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick J. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell D. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skooliepalooza LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SkooIiepalooza.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Jones Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?