NEODRON LTD. v. PANASONIC CORPORATION; PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: NEODRON LTD.
Defendant: PANASONIC CORPORATION; PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation of North America and Panasonic Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv00241
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
August 11, 2020 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Panasonic Corporation to 11/10/2020; Panasonic Corporation of North America to 11/10/2020. (nkl, )
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/10/2020. (nkl, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by NEODRON LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Ma on behalf of NEODRON LTD. (Ma, Jonathan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip X Wang on behalf of NEODRON LTD. (Wang, Philip)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Jay Chung on behalf of NEODRON LTD. (Chung, C.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NEODRON LTD.. Panasonic Corporation of North America served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Mirzaie, Reza)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Panasonic Corporation. (ch, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA. (ch, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by NEODRON LTD. re #1 Complaint, of Related Cases (Mirzaie, Reza)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NEODRON LTD. (Mirzaie, Reza)
July 17, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against PANASONIC CORPORATION; PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7898189.), filed by NEODRON LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEODRON LTD. v. PANASONIC CORPORATION; PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEODRON LTD.
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Philip X Wang
Represented By: C. Jay Chung
Represented By: Jonathan Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PANASONIC CORPORATION; PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?