Simon Property Group, LP v American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Simon Property Group, LP
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv00267
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/9/2020. (ch, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Simon Property Group, LP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting as modified #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/3/2020. (ch, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to John Thomas Vitt on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Vitt, John)
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Laud, Sanjiv)
September 1, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for U.S. Bank National Association. Deadline 10/9/2020 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re U.S. Bank National Association.( Laud, Sanjiv)
September 1, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. Deadline 10/9/2020 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc (Craft, Roger)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.( Findlay, Eric)
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Pa Nhia Vang on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7971384. (Vang, Pa Nhia)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John Thomas Vitt on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7971141. (Vitt, John)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by U.S. Bank National Association re #7 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases U.S. Bank's Notice of Intent to Oppose Plaintiff's "Unopposed" Motion to Consolidate Cases (Laud, Sanjiv)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sanjiv Prakash Laud on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Laud, Sanjiv)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 REDACTION to #1 Sealed Document, COMPLAINT by Simon Property Group, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Simon Property Group, LP (Doan, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Simon Property Group, LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Simon Property Group, LP. (Doan, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Randall Akin on behalf of Simon Property Group, LP (Akin, Kyle)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mariah Leigh Hornok on behalf of Simon Property Group, LP (Hornok, Mariah)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Simon Property Group, LP (Doan, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Sealed Document - Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Receipt 600053749 for 400.00 filing fee) (ch, ) Modified on 8/17/2020 (ch, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #5 Civil Cover Sheet Corrected) (ch, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon Property Group, LP v American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: John Thomas Vitt
Represented By: Pa Nhia Vang
Represented By: Sanjiv Prakash Laud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Property Group, LP
Represented By: Mariah Leigh Hornok
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Kyle Randall Akin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?