Ericsson, Inc. et al v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson and Ericsson, Inc.
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00010
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2021 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap -- CANCELLED(aeb)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Travis Underwood terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/9/2021. (nkl, )
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 All proceedings in the above-captioned case are STAYED. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/9/2021. (ch, )
March 5, 2021 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Underwood, James)
March 5, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly Elin Engelmann on behalf of Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Engelmann, Holly)
March 5, 2021 Filing 21 Joint MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEND LOCAL PATENT RULE 3-1 TO 3-4 DEADLINES by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Stay OF PROCEEDINGS by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mizzo, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 25, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2021 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (aeb)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/22/2021. (nkl, )
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Extend Local Patent Rule 3-1 to 3-4. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/22/2021. (nkl, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
February 19, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION extend their respective Local Patent Rule 3-1, 3-2, 3-3, and 3-4 deadlines for all patents asserted by fourteen (14) days by Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that the above case is deconsolidated from the Lead case 2:21-cv-1. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/17/21. (ch, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned case is hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:21-cv-001. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/8/2021. (ch, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas M Mathews on behalf of Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Mathews, Nicholas)
February 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Baxter, Samuel)
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theodore Stevenson, III on behalf of Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Stevenson, Theodore)
February 4, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
February 4, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa)
February 4, 2021 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Smith, Melissa)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Smith, Melissa)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(nkl, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Travis Underwood on behalf of Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Underwood, James)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Bittner, Michael)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Brett Johnson on behalf of Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Johnson, Michael)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Melsheimer, Thomas)
January 15, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
January 15, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8200349.), filed by Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melsheimer, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ericsson, Inc. et al v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Holly Elin Engelmann
Represented By: Michael Brett Johnson
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: James Travis Underwood
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericsson, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Holly Elin Engelmann
Represented By: Michael Brett Johnson
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: James Travis Underwood
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?