Haugen v. Activision Publishing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clayton Haugen
Defendant: Infinity Ward, Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc, Activision Publishing, Inc. and Major League Gaming Corp.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00035
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Activision Blizzard Inc, Activision Publishing, Inc., Infinity Ward, Inc., Major League Gaming Corp..( Smith, Melissa)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Activision Blizzard Inc, Activision Publishing, Inc., Infinity Ward, Inc., Major League Gaming Corp..( Smith, Melissa)
February 9, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Infinity Ward, Inc. to 3/28/2021; Activision Blizzard Inc to 3/28/2021; Activision Publishing, Inc. to 3/28/2021; Major League Gaming Corp. to 3/28/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 9, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Infinity Ward, Inc. to 4/12/2021; Activision Blizzard Inc to 4/12/2021; Activision Publishing, Inc. to 4/12/2021; Major League Gaming Corp. to 4/12/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Activision Blizzard Inc, Activision Publishing, Inc., Infinity Ward, Inc., Major League Gaming Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(ch, )
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Micah Dortch on behalf of Clayton Haugen (Dortch, Timothy)
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher David Lindstrom on behalf of Clayton Haugen (Lindstrom, Christopher)
February 3, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
February 3, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Zummo, Patrick)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Clayton Haugen. (Zummo, Patrick)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zummo, Patrick)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8229357.), filed by Clayton Haugen.(Zummo, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment) (ch, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haugen v. Activision Publishing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Ward, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activision Blizzard Inc
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activision Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major League Gaming Corp.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Haugen
Represented By: Patrick Zummo
Represented By: Timothy Micah Dortch
Represented By: Christopher David Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?