US INVENTOR INC. et al v. HIRSHFELD, in his official capacity Performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Plaintiff: LARRY GOLDEN, Tinnus Enterprises, LLC, WORLD SOURCE ENTERPRISES, LLC, RAMZI MAALOUF, E-Watch, Inc, 360 HEROS, INC and US INVENTOR INC.
Defendant: DREW HIRSHFELD, in his official capacity Performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Case Number: 2:2021cv00047
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to #17 Notice (Other), filed by 360 HEROS, INC, E-Watch, Inc, LARRY GOLDEN, RAMZI MAALOUF, Tinnus Enterprises, LLC, US INVENTOR INC., WORLD SOURCE ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Smith, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by DREW HIRSHFELD, in his official capacity Performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: New Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Feldon, Gary)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by 360 HEROS, INC, E-Watch, Inc, LARRY GOLDEN, RAMZI MAALOUF, Tinnus Enterprises, LLC, US INVENTOR INC., WORLD SOURCE ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Smith, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG EVENT Document # 15, RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ***FILED IN ERROR***RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by 360 HEROS, INC, E-Watch, Inc, LARRY GOLDEN, RAMZI MAALOUF, Tinnus Enterprises, LLC, US INVENTOR INC., WORLD SOURCE ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Smith, Michael) Modified on 3/11/2021 (ch, ).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/9/2021. (ch, )
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DREW HIRSHFELD, in his official capacity Performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit)(Feldon, Gary)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DREW HIRSHFELD, in his official capacity Performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldon, Gary)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 360 HEROS, INC, E-Watch, Inc, LARRY GOLDEN, RAMZI MAALOUF, Tinnus Enterprises, LLC, US INVENTOR INC., WORLD SOURCE ENTERPRISES, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Telesis group for E-Watch, Inc. (Smith, Michael)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Defendant on 2/11/2021, filed by WORLD SOURCE ENTERPRISES, LLC, 360 HEROS, INC, E-Watch, Inc, Tinnus Enterprises, LLC, RAMZI MAALOUF, US INVENTOR INC., LARRY GOLDEN., SUMMONS Returned Executed by WORLD SOURCE ENTERPRISES, LLC, 360 HEROS, INC, E-Watch, Inc, Tinnus Enterprises, LLC, RAMZI MAALOUF, US INVENTOR INC., LARRY GOLDEN. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Greenspoon, Robert)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert P Greenspoon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8256030. (Greenspoon, Robert)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(Smith, Michael)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by E-Watch, Inc, LARRY GOLDEN, RAMZI MAALOUF, Tinnus Enterprises, LLC, US INVENTOR INC., WORLD SOURCE ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DREW HIRSHFELD, in his official capacity Performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office, filed by WORLD SOURCE ENTERPRISES, LLC, 360 HEROS, INC, E-Watch, Inc, Tinnus Enterprises, LLC, RAMZI MAALOUF, US INVENTOR INC., LARRY GOLDEN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gary Feldon on behalf of DREW HIRSHFELD, in his official capacity Performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office. Filing fee $ 100. (nkl, )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WORLD SOURCE ENTERPRISES, LLC, 360 HEROS, INC, E-Watch, Inc, Tinnus Enterprises, LLC, RAMZI MAALOUF, US INVENTOR INC., LARRY GOLDEN. (Smith, Michael)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to DREW HIRSHFELD, in his official capacity Performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR***SUMMONS Issued as to DREW HIRSHFELD, in his official capacity Performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) Modified on 2/11/2021 (ch, ).
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DREW HIRSHFELD, in his official capacity Performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8239884.), filed by WORLD SOURCE ENTERPRISES, LLC, 360 HEROS, INC, E-Watch, Inc, Tinnus Enterprises, LLC, RAMZI MAALOUF, US INVENTOR INC., LARRY GOLDEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US INVENTOR INC. et al v. HIRSHFELD, in his official capacity Performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY GOLDEN
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Robert P Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tinnus Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Robert P Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WORLD SOURCE ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Robert P Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMZI MAALOUF
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Robert P Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E-Watch, Inc
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Robert P Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 360 HEROS, INC
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Robert P Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US INVENTOR INC.
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Robert P Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DREW HIRSHFELD, in his official capacity Performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Represented By: Gary Feldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?