Solas OLED Ltd. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Solas OLED Ltd.
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00105
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John C Kappos on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8373636. (Kappos, John)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas J Whilt on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8373542. (Whilt, Nicholas)
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan K Yagura on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Yagura, Ryan)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., filed by Solas OLED Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mirzaie, Reza)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 6/14/2021; Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. answer due 6/14/2021. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/5/2021. (ch, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, )
March 23, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
March 23, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Shrin Tsuei on behalf of Solas OLED Ltd. (Tsuei, James)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil Alan Rubin on behalf of Solas OLED Ltd. (Rubin, Neil)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Solas OLED Ltd. (Fenster, Marc)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Solas OLED Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Solas OLED Ltd. (Mirzaie, Reza)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8311799.), filed by Solas OLED Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es))(Mirzaie, Reza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solas OLED Ltd. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: John C Kappos
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Nicholas J Whilt
Represented By: Ryan K Yagura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: John C Kappos
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Nicholas J Whilt
Represented By: Ryan K Yagura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solas OLED Ltd.
Represented By: James Shrin Tsuei
Represented By: Neil Alan Rubin
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?