Turner v. Hallsville Independent School District
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Defendant: Hallsville Independent School District
Case Number: 2:2021cv00447
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Hallsville Independent School District. (Mooney, Andrea)
January 31, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 2/15/2022 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga)
January 24, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Terrance Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hommel, William)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2022 01:50 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/11/22. (ch, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 11 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Brief in Support by Hallsville Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Defendants' First Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Mooney, Andrea)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Terrance Turner Certificate of Interested Parties (Hommel, William)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Terrance Turner (Hommel, William)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 Defendant Hallsville Independent School District's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Hallsville Independent School District.(Mooney, Andrea)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First-Amended Complaint and Brief in Support by Hallsville Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Mooney, Andrea)
January 10, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Terrance Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hommel, William)
December 28, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Hallsville Independent School District, filed by Terrance Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hommel, William)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint and Brief in Support by Hallsville Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: TWC Charge of Discrimination)(Mooney, Andrea) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2021: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terrance Turner. Hallsville Independent School District served on 12/12/2021, answer due 1/2/2022. (Hommel, William)
December 13, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Hallsville Independent School District. (nkl, )
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hallsville Independent School District ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8699145.), filed by Terrance Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hommel, William)
December 7, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
December 7, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Hallsville Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Represented By: William S Hommel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallsville Independent School District
Represented By: Andrea L Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?