Mallard IP LLC v. Radisys Corporation
Plaintiff: Mallard IP LLC
Defendant: Radisys Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00471
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned case is hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:21-cv-00472. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/2022. (ch, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mallard IP LLC.( Alexander, Cortney)
January 18, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Mallard IP LLC to 2/21/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mallard IP LLC. Radisys Corporation served on 12/30/2021, answer due 1/20/2022. (Alexander, Cortney)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Radisys Corporation. (klc, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mallard IP LLC (Alexander, Cortney)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Alexander, Cortney)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Radisys Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8726211.), filed by Mallard IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,603,330, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Chart for the '330 Patent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, Cortney)
December 29, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (klc, )
December 29, 2021 District Judge Rodney Gilstrap added. (klc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallard IP LLC v. Radisys Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallard IP LLC
Represented By: Cortney S Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radisys Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?