Dyess v. Koninklijke Philips N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Derek Dyess
Defendant: Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America, LLC, Philips Holding USA, Inc. and Philips RS North America LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00330
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Roy S Payne
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-46) RECEIVED ON 9/16/2022. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel (klc, )
September 16, 2022 Interdistrict transfer to the Western District of Pennsylvania. (klc, )
August 29, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig D Zips on behalf of Derek Dyess (Zips, Craig)
August 25, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips Holding USA, Inc., Philips North America, LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(ch, )
August 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9087704.), filed by Derek Dyess. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blankenship, William)
August 24, 2022 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, )
August 24, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyess v. Koninklijke Philips N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Dyess
Represented By: William F Blankenship, III
Represented By: Craig D Zips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninklijke Philips N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Holding USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips RS North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?