STA Group LLC v. Motorola Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: STA Group LLC
Defendant: Motorola Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00381
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Motorola Solutions, Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
October 14, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Motorola Solutions, Inc. to 11/25/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
October 14, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Motorola Solutions, Inc. to 12/10/2022. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
October 13, 2022 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Motorola Solutions, Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
October 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Duffy Richards on behalf of STA Group LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9172530. (Richards, Patrick)
October 11, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James A Shimota on behalf of STA Group LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9172520. (Shimota, James)
October 7, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STA Group LLC. Motorola Solutions, Inc. served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. (Hill, Jack Wesley)
September 30, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Motorola Solutions, Inc.. (klc, )
September 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of STA Group LLC (Hill, Jack Wesley)
September 30, 2022 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STA Group LLC. (Fair, Andrea)
September 30, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by STA Group LLC (Fair, Andrea)
September 30, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fair, Andrea)
September 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Motorola Solutions, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9157792.), filed by STA Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Fair, Andrea)
September 30, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
September 30, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STA Group LLC v. Motorola Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STA Group LLC
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: James A Shimota
Represented By: Patrick Duffy Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?