Minor v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Corey Minor
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2009cv00317
Filed: July 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Schell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate/Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 23 MOTION for Reconsideration re 22 Judgment filed by Corey Minor. ORDERED that Movant's motion for reconsideration (dkt #23) is DENIED. It is also ORDERED that all motions filed by any party not previously ruled upon are DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/2/2017. (daj, )
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 16 Report and Recommendation. ORDERED that the motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence is DENIED and the case is DISMISSED with prejudice. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. ORDERED that all motions by either party not previously ruled on are hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/27/2012. (kls, )
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Corey Minor. It is accordingly recommended that Movant's motion for relief under 28 USC 2255 be denied and the case dismissed with prejudice. It is further recommended that a certificate of appealability be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 7/30/2012. (kls, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minor v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: J Andrew Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?