Weaver v. Thaler
Petitioner: Joseph Francis Weaver
Respondent: Rick Thaler
Case Number: 4:2010cv00046
Filed: February 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Schell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 47 MOTION for Relief from a Judge or Order FRCP Rule 60 filed by Joseph Francis Weaver. ORDERED that Petitioner's motion for relief from judgment (docket entry #47) is DENIED. Any motions not previously ruled upon are DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/28/2014. (kls, )
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 45 MOTION for Reconsideration re 43 Judgment filed by Joseph Francis Weaver. ORDERED that Petitioner's motion for reconsideration (docket entry #45) is DENIED. Any motions not previously ruled upon are DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/10/2013. (kls, )
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER OF DISMISSAL ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 40 Report and Recommendation. ORDERED that the petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DENIED and the case is DISMISSED with prejudice. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that all motions by either party not previously ruled on are hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/26/2013. (kls, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER to Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(srussell, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/3/2010.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Thaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Francis Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Thaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?