L.G. Motorsports, Inc. v. NGMCO, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: L.G. Motorsports, Inc.
Defendant: NGMCO, Inc., Michelin North America, Inc. and Doug Fehan
Case Number: 4:2011cv00112
Filed: March 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Schell
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE - GRANTING 118 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Michelin North America, Inc., 135 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/26/2014. (baf, )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE - GRANTING 72 Motion for Summary Judgment GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 73 Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff on All Glaims. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/30/2013. (baf, )
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM ORDER, OPINION AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff on All Claims filed by Michelin North America, Inc., 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NGMCO, Inc., 45 Amended Complaint filed by L.G. Motorsports, Inc. GRANTING 65 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Brief in Support filed by L.G. Motorsports, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 6/5/2013. (baf, )
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. The claims against Defendant Fehan are hereby dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/2012. (pad, )
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NGMCO, Inc should be granted in part and denied in part, Plaintiff should be required to file an amended complaint accordingly and a scheduling order should be entered to govern the remaining claims in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 3/6/12. (ttm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.G. Motorsports, Inc. v. NGMCO, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.G. Motorsports, Inc.
Represented By: Peyton pHealey
Represented By: Patrick William Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NGMCO, Inc.
Represented By: David A Ettinger
Represented By: Timothy Allen Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelin North America, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Monroe Bullion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Fehan
Represented By: Cynthia J Haffey
Represented By: Sally Christine Helppie
Represented By: Sheldon Klein
Represented By: Eunice Kim Nakamura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?