Imperium (IP) Holdings, Inc. v. Apple Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Imperium (IP) Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc., Kyocera Communications, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Nokia Inc., Research In Motion Corporation and Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv00163
Filed: March 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joe W Redden, Jr on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation (Redden, Joe)
April 5, 2011 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Research In Motion Corporation.( Richardson, Michael)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - The Court ORDERS plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for a scheduling conference when all defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice must be filed within 5 days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/1/2011. (baf, )
March 31, 2011 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Kyocera Communications, Inc.. (baf, )
March 31, 2011 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (baf, )
March 31, 2011 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.. (baf, )
March 31, 2011 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc.. (baf, )
March 31, 2011 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Nokia Inc.. (baf, )
March 31, 2011 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Research In Motion Corporation. (baf, )
March 31, 2011 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.. (baf, )
March 31, 2011 Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.. (baf, )
March 30, 2011 Filing 5 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant pursuant to a Standing Order. (baf, )
March 30, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT sent to Imperium (IP) Holdings, Inc. (baf, )
March 30, 2011 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
March 30, 2011 Case ASSIGNED to Judge Michael H. Schneider. (baf, )
March 30, 2011 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Imperium (IP) Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Imperium (IP) Holdings, Inc.. (Fisch, Alan)
March 30, 2011 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fisch, Alan)
March 30, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Apple Inc., Kyocera Communications, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Nokia Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2962750.), filed by Imperium (IP) Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,271,884, # 2 Exhibit B - US Patent No. 6,838,651, # 3 Exhibit C - US Patent No. 6,838,715, # 4 Exhibit D - US Patent No. 7,064,768, # 5 Exhibit E - US Patent No. 7,109,535, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisch, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imperium (IP) Holdings, Inc. v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imperium (IP) Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Michael Fisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Ruben Singh Bains
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyocera Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Winstol D Carter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Winstol D Carter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Inc.
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research In Motion Corporation
Represented By: Joe W Redden, Jr
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?