Angle v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Angle
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Barrett Burke Wilson Castle Daffin & Frappier LPP, John Doe 1-100 and Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP
Case Number: 4:2011cv00352
Filed: June 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Denton
Presiding Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Schell
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 11 Motion to Dismiss Certain Defendants. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/2012. (pad, )
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 11 MOTION to Dismiss CERTAIN DEFFENDANTS' filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 1/26/2012. (baf, )
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Peggy Angle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 9/19/2011. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angle v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Angle
Represented By: Taylor Phillip Willingham
Represented By: Gary Gene Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jason D Clark
Represented By: Christopher Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Jason D Clark
Represented By: Christopher Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Burke Wilson Castle Daffin & Frappier LPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?