Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc. v. Dr Pepper Bottling Co Featured Case
Plaintiff: Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.
Defendant: Dr Pepper Bottling Company of Dublin, Texas
Case Number: 4:2011cv00398
Filed: June 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2012 Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dr Pepper Bottling Company of Dublin, Texas, Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.. (Beckwith, Van)
December 22, 2011 By agreement of the parties and upon approval by Judge Mazzant, the parties' deadlines to file responses to the motion for leave to file under seal (Dkt. #27) and motion to dismiss (Dkt. #28) are extended to January 13, 2012, with replies thereto to be filed no later than January 23, 2012 (tls, )
December 14, 2011 By agreement of the parties and upon approval by Judge Mazzant, the parties' deadlines to file responses to the motion for leave to file under seal (Dkt. #27) and motion to dismiss (Dkt. #28) are extended to December 22, 2011, with replies thereto to be filed no later than January 6, 2012 (tls, )
December 7, 2011 By agreement of the parties and upon approval by Judge Mazzant, the parties' deadlines to file responses to the motion for leave to file under seal (Dkt. #27) and motion to dismiss (Dkt. #28) are extended to December 14, 2011, with replies thereto to be filed no later than December 23, 2011 (tls, )
November 29, 2011 By agreement of the parties and upon approval by Judge Mazzant, the parties' deadlines to file responses to the motion for leave to file under seal (Dkt. #27) and motion to dismiss (Dkt. #28) are extended to December 8, 2011, with replies thereto to be filed no later than December 21, 2011 (tls, )
November 11, 2011 Filing 28 SEALED MOTION To Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaims by Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Beckwith, Van)
November 11, 2011 Filing 27 MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaims by Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beckwith, Van)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 11/10/2011. (pad, )
November 7, 2011 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Dr Pepper Bottling Company of Dublin, Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 28, 2011 Filing 24 Second Amended ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc. by Dr Pepper Bottling Company of Dublin, Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 12, 2011 Mediation packet mailed to mediator. Mediation Report deadline set for 3/19/2012. (cm, )
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Glen M Ashworth added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 10/6/11. (cm, )
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Setting set for 7/9/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2011. Discovery due by 3/30/2012. Expert Witness List due from Plaintiff by 2/10/2012 and from Defendant by 3/9/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 10/28/2011. Mediation Completion due by 3/19/2012. Motions to Dismiss due by 11/11/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 3/26/2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/8/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 10/6/11. (cm, )
October 6, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant: Scheduling Conference held on 10/6/2011. (tls, )
October 4, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Alden Graves on behalf of Dr Pepper Bottling Company of Dublin, Texas (Graves, Thomas)
September 29, 2011 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mureen, Jonathan)
September 26, 2011 Filing 19 ANSWER to 17 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,,,, by Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc..(Beckwith, Van)
September 26, 2011 Filing 18 ***FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** CLAIM Amended Counterclaim by Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.. (Beckwith, Van) Modified on 9/26/2011 (cm, ).
September 26, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 18, CLAIM Amended Counterclaim, to be Refiled using correct event code. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (cm, )
September 12, 2011 Filing 17 ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc. by Dr Pepper Bottling Company of Dublin, Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 1, 2011 Filing 16 ANSWER to 9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,, by Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc..(Beckwith, Van)
August 31, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richter Darryl Burke on behalf of Dr Pepper Bottling Company of Dublin, Texas (Burke, Richter)
August 30, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE by Dr Pepper Bottling Company of Dublin, Texas NOTICE OF FINANCIALLY INTERESTED PARTY (Baxter, Samuel)
August 25, 2011 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Application for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctions against Dr Pepper Bottling Company of Dublin, Texas, filed by Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Beckwith, Van)
August 24, 2011 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dr Pepper Bottling Company of Dublin, Texas identifying Corporate Parent None for Dr Pepper Bottling Company of Dublin, Texas. (Baxter, Samuel)
August 9, 2011 Filing 9 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc. by Dr Pepper Bottling Company of Dublin, Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Wolens, Steven)
June 28, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Application for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctions against DR PEPPER BOTTLING COMPANY OF DUBLIN, TEXAS ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3098703.), filed by Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - USPTO Records, # 2 Exhibit B - Dublin Dr Pepper Logo Examples, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons(es))(Beckwith, Van)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc. v. Dr Pepper Bottling Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.
Represented By: Van Harold Beckwith
Represented By: Jonathan Robert Mureen
Represented By: Lawrence Augustine Phillips
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Pepper Bottling Company of Dublin, Texas
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?