Whatley, III v. AHF Financial Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Whatley, III
Defendant: AHF Financial Services, LLC and Alphine H. Freeman III
Case Number: 4:2011cv00488
Filed: August 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Denton
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 139 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, 135 Motion for Sanctions filed by X-Ray Associates of New Mexico, P.C., Alphine H. Freeman III, AHF Financial Services, LLC. Defendants Joint Motion for Sanctions Under 28 U.S.C.§ 1927 and FRCP 37 [Doc. #135] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/5/13. (cm, ) Modified on 9/5/2013 (cm, ).
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Granting 48 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Alphine H. Freeman III, AHF Financial Services, LLC, 120 Report and Recommendations, Denying 47 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas E. Whatley, III. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. All relief not previously granted is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/21/13. (cm, )
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER PARTIALLY ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 85 Report and Recommendations, 49 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by X-Ray Associates of New Mexico, P.C.. Defendant X-Ray Associates of New Mexico, PCsMotion for Summary Judgment [Doc. #49] is GRANTED. Defendant X-Ray Associates of New Mexico, PC is dismissed from this litigation, since the court has dismissed all claims against this Defendant. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/17/13. (cm, )
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER adopting 45 Report and Recommendation. Ordered that Defendant's X-Ray Associates of New Mexico PC's 30 motion for judgment on the pleadings be granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's FDCPA claim against X-Ray is dismissed. All other claims shall remain at this time. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/11/2012. (bjc)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 27 Motion to Dismiss filed by Thomas E. Whatley, III, 35 Report and Recommendations,. Plaintiff Thomas Whatleys Motion to Dismiss X-Ray Associates of New Mexico, P.Cs Counterclaims [Dkt. #27] is GRANTED, and the counterclaims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/14/12. (cm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whatley, III v. AHF Financial Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Whatley, III
Represented By: Dennis Robert Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHF Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphine H. Freeman III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?