Whatley III v. CreditWatch Services, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Whatley III
Defendant: CreditWatch Services, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2011cv00493
Filed: August 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Denton
Presiding Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Schell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM OPINION ON DAMAGES UNDER THE TELEPHONE CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/31/2014. (baf, )
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 18 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CreditWatch Services, Ltd., 87 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 8/1/2012. (baf, )
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CreditWatch Services, Ltd., 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas E. Whatley III, 27 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Thomas E. Whatley III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 7/12/2012. (baf, )
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CreditWatch Services, Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 5/10/2012. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whatley III v. CreditWatch Services, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Whatley III
Represented By: Dennis Robert Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CreditWatch Services, Ltd.
Represented By: Robbie LuAnn Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?