Little v. Technical Specialty Products, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dale Little
Defendant: Technical Specialty Products, LLC, Keith Lear and Donna Lear
Case Number: 4:2011cv00717
Filed: October 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES - GRANTING 137 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/31/2014. (baf, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 140 MOTION for New Trial filed by Keith Lear, Donna Lear, Technical Specialty Products, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 3/18/2014. (baf, )
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 10/23/2013. (baf, )
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 70 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Brief in Support filed by Dale Little, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 73 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Motiont to Str ike Plaintiff's Experts MOTION to Amend/Correct 73 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Motiont to Strike Plaintiff's Experts filed by Technical Specialty Products, LLC, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Technical Specialty Products, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/15/2013. (baf, )
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 24 Report and Recommendations, DENYING 14 Motion to Compel, Motion to Stay,, filed by Keith Lear, Donna Lear, Technical Specialty Products, LLC. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/1/2012. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. Technical Specialty Products, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technical Specialty Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Lear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Lear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Little
Represented By: David Ellis Watkins
Represented By: Jason Edward Winford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?