Williams v. USA
Petitioner: Stacey Laveral Williams
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2012cv00131
Filed: March 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Schell
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 31 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Stacey Laveral Williams. ORDERED that the construed motion for certificate of appealability is DENIED and the motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (dkt #31) is DENIED. All motions by either party not previously ruled upon are DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/26/2016. (kls, )
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, ORDER, Motions terminated: 28 MOTION for Relief Pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, filed by Stacey Laveral Williams. Movant filed the instant motion approximately 15 months after Final Judg ment. Furthermore, the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals denied Movant's motion for certificate of appealability on this matter on April 25, 2016. For these additional reasons, the motion should be denied. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Movant 's Motion for Reconsideration (dkt #28) filed pursuant to Rule 60 is DENIED. All motions by either party not previously ruled upon are DENIED. Movant should file any future motions with the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 6/29/2016. (kls, )
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; granting 23 MOTION for Status of FRAP, Rule 59(e) Motion filed by Stacey Laveral Williams; denying 25 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Stacey Laveral Williams; denying 22 MOTION for Reconsideration re 21 Judgment filed by Stacey Laveral Williams. All motions by either party not previously ruled upon are DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/28/2015. (kls, )
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 14 Report and Recommendation. ORDERED that the motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence is DENIED and Movant's case is DISMISSED with prejudice. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Finally, it isORDERED that all motions not previously ruled on are hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/24/2015. (kls, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stacey Laveral Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?