Byers v. Bank of America NA et al
Plaintiff: Scotty Byers
Defendant: Bank of America NA, ReconTrust Company NA and The Bank of New York Mellon NA
Case Number: 4:2012cv00143
Filed: March 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Schell
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE GRANTING 33 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Bank of America NA, ReconTrust Company NA, The Bank of New York Mellon NA, 41 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/6/2013. (baf, )
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 33 Second MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Bank of America NA, ReconTrust Company NA, The Bank of New York Mellon NA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 6/6/2013. (baf, )
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 6 MOTION re 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof MOTION re 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Bank of America NA, ReconTrust Company NA, The Bank of New York Mellon NA, 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Bank of America NA, ReconTrust Company NA, The Bank of New York Mellon NA.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 8/6/2012. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byers v. Bank of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Joshua Andrew Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReconTrust Company NA
Represented By: Joshua Andrew Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon NA
Represented By: Joshua Andrew Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scotty Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?