UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Michael J Fisher and Brian Bullock
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Intervenor: New York State Department of Financial Services
Case Number: 4:2012cv00543
Filed: August 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Grayson
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 570 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that the Motion by Relators' Counsel Fish & Richardson P.C. to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. #337 Homeward; Dkt. 539 Ocwen) is hereby DENIED. Relators' Counsel Boyd & Associates' Emergency Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement (Dkt. #348 Homeward; Dkt. 550 Ocwen) is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/3/2017. (baf, )
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 496 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - GRANTING IN PART AND DENING IN PART 400 SEALED MOTION [RELATORS' MOTION FOR RELIEF UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 37 AGAINST DEFENDANTS OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, AND OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION] filed by Brian Bullock, Michael J Fisher. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/8/2016. (baf, )
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 418 SEALED MOTION For Protective Order to Quash Notice of Deposition of Victor O'Laughlen filed by Brian Bullock, Michael J Fisher. It is further ORDERED that Defendants should provide a new notice of deposition andsubpoena in accordance with the Courts Order by no later than seven days of this Order. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/7/2016. (baf, )
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 338 SEALED MOTION TO (I) RECONSIDER JANUARY 22, 2016 ORDER GRANTING IN PART RELATORS' MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER [OCWEN DKT. NO 322; HOMEWARD DKT. NO. 240] AND (II) MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/26/2016. (baf, )
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER - GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 291 SEALED MOTION RELATORS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Brian Bullock, Michael J Fisher. It is further ORDERED that Defendants affirmative defenses are DISMISSED withprejudice as to the following: (1) failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; (2) failure to plead fraud with particularity; (3) lack of standing; (4) barred by the public disclosure b ar; (5) barred by the statute of limitations; (6) barred by res judicata, collateral estoppel, and equitable estoppel; (7) barred by the doctrine of unclean hands; and (8) barred because the Government did not rely on the false statements. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/25/2016. (baf, )
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 438 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 298 SEALED MOTION RELATORS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Brian Bullock, Michael J Fisher, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 327 SEALE D MOTION (Defendants' Objections and Motion to Strike Certain Exhibits Attached to Relators' December 29, 2015 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/24/2016. (baf, )
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 260 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Information filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation. It is further ORDERED that Relat ors should produce their supplemental privilege log, which conforms to the Courts Order, to Defendants by no later than Tuesday, March 29, 2016. It is further ORDERED that Relators should supplement their answers to Interrogatories numbers seven and eight, pursuant to the Courts Order, to Defendants by no later than Tuesday, March 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/15/2016. (baf, )
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 293 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:12-CV-461 and 4:12-CV-543 filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/29/2016. (baf, )
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 267 MOTION for Protective Order Motion to Modify Protective Order filed by Brian Bullock, Michael J Fisher. It is further ORDERED that within seven days of this Order, Relators should file with the Court a proposed protective order consistent with the Courts findings herein. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/2/2016. (baf, )
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 231 MOTION to Dismiss under Rules 8, 9(b), and 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/10/2015. (baf, )
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 178 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM RELATORS AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/31/2015. (baf, )
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 64 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Rule 56 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/1/2015. (baf, )
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 65 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(6) and Rule 9(b) Motion to Dismiss filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC.. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/300/2015. (baf, )
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 116 SEALED MOTION filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, 154 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by New York State Department of Financial Services. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/26/2015. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: J Kevin McClendon
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Fisher
Represented By: Samuel L Boyd
Represented By: Catherine Carlyle Jobe
Represented By: Michael Brett Johnson
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David Scott Morris
Represented By: Roger D Sanders
Represented By: Grant K Schmidt
Represented By: Chad Brian Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Bullock
Represented By: Samuel L Boyd
Represented By: Catherine Carlyle Jobe
Represented By: Michael Brett Johnson
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David Scott Morris
Represented By: Grant K Schmidt
Represented By: Chad Brian Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Angelina Christina
Represented By: Gabriel Alan Crowson
Represented By: Richard Dwayne Danner
Represented By: Melissa Hope Harris
Represented By: Daniel T Plunkett
Represented By: John T Rouse
Represented By: H. Hunter Twiford, III
Represented By: Gerard E Wimberly, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: New York State Department of Financial Services
Represented By: Peter C Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?