Lohri v. Countrywide Home Loans Inc. d/b/a Bank of America, N.A./ BAC Home Loans Servicing LP et al
Plaintiff: Debra A. Lohri
Defendant: MERSCORP Holdings Inc. D/B/A MERS Inc., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and All Aliases, Blue Star Title D/B/A Sendera Title Company, Recontrust Company, U.S. Bank National Association For CSAB, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Financial Corporation, DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc., Tommy Bastian-Original Trustee, Suntrust Mortgage Inc., PMI Insurance Company, Countrywide Home Loans Inc. d/b/a Bank of America, N.A./ BAC Home Loans Servicing LP and Bank of America N.A./ BAC Home Loans Servicing L.P. and Any Other Trading Names TX2-97-01-17
Case Number: 4:2012cv00568
Filed: August 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Denton
Presiding Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Schell
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 62 Motion to Dismiss filed by CoreLogic, 93 Motion for Summary Judgment, Motion for Order to Show Cause filed by Debra A. Lohri, 64 Motion to Dismiss fil ed by Debra A. Lohri, 63 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Recontrust Company, MERSCORP Holdings Inc. D/B/A MERS Inc., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and All Aliases, Bank of America N.A./ BAC Home Loans Servicing L.P. and Any Other Trading Names TX 2-97-01-17, Countrywide Home Loans Inc. d/b/a Bank of America, N.A./ BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, 66 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Debra A. Lohri, 88 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Debra A. Lohri. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Corelogic as Defendant (Dkt. 64) and Defendant Corelogic's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Dkt. 62) are GRANTED and any claims asserted against Defendant Corelogic are dismissed without prejudice. Any cla ims against Defendant Blue Star Title Company are also dismissed without prejudice. Further, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 63) is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment (Dkts. 66, 88 and 93) are DENIED. Plaintiff s hall take nothing by any of her claims against Defendants Bank of America, ReconTrust Company, MERS, Countrywide, WellsFargo Bank and U.S. Bank National Association, those claims are dismissed with prejudice, and this matter shall be closed on the court's docket. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/28/2014. (kls, )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 53 Report and Recommendation; denying 24 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Debra A. Lohri, 56 Report and Recommendation; 57 Report and Recommendatio n; denying 25 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Debra A. Lohri; denying 23 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Debra A. Lohri. Therefore, Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Corelogic (Dkt. 24) is DENIED, Plaintiff� 39;s Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Recontrust (Dkt. 25) is DENIED, and Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A. (Dkt. 23)is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/30/2013. (kls, )
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Debra A. Lohri.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 1/25/2013. (pad, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lohri v. Countrywide Home Loans Inc. d/b/a Bank of America, N.A./ BAC Home Loans Servicing LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERSCORP Holdings Inc. D/B/A MERS Inc.
Represented By: Richard Dwayne Danner
Represented By: David Christopher Romness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and All Aliases
Represented By: Richard Dwayne Danner
Represented By: David Christopher Romness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Star Title D/B/A Sendera Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company
Represented By: David Christopher Romness
Represented By: Richard Dwayne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association For CSAB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Represented By: Matthew Kyle Hansen
Represented By: Arthur Elex Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Arthur Elex Anthony
Represented By: Matthew Kyle Hansen
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Financial Corporation
Represented By: Arthur Elex Anthony
Represented By: Matthew Kyle Hansen
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Elex Anthony
Represented By: Matthew Kyle Hansen
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Bastian-Original Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage Inc.
Represented By: Michael John McKleroy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMI Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Inc. d/b/a Bank of America, N.A./ BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: David Christopher Romness
Represented By: Richard Dwayne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A./ BAC Home Loans Servicing L.P. and Any Other Trading Names TX2-97-01-17
Represented By: David Christopher Romness
Represented By: Richard Dwayne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra A. Lohri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?