Jackson et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Albert Jackson and Brandi Graves Jackson
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00727
Filed: December 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Grayson
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE GRANTING 29 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., 35 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/5/2014. (baf, )
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 32 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Albert Jackson, Brandi Graves Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 9/2/2014. (baf, )
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 24 Report and Recommendations, DENYING, except as to Plaintiffs' claim under 12 C.F.R. 1024.41 15 Motion to Dismiss, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/14/2014. (baf, )
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 9 Report and Recommendations, DENYING 4 Motion to Dismiss filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/20/2014. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Britton Dale McClung
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Jackson
Represented By: Julie Pettit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Graves Jackson
Represented By: Julie Pettit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?