Imperium IP Holdings (Cayman), Ltd. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Imperium IP Holdings (Cayman), Ltd.
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Techwin Co., Ltd. and Samsung Opto-Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv00371
Filed: June 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Grayson
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MEMORANUDM OPINION AND ORDER. Imperium's Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Dkt. # 363 ) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff is awarded $7,080,695.77 in attorneys' fees. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/3/2018. (rpc, )
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 369 SEALED MOTION for Taxation of Costs filed by Imperium IP Holdings (Cayman), Ltd. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/13/2017. (baf, )
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MEMORANDUM OPINION. - Before the Court are issues relating to enhanced damages, issues regarding the Sony License Agreement, and the Courts rendering of final judgment. In view of evidence of Defendants conduct at the time of accused infringement and after reviewing the Read factors, the Court finds that enhancement is warranted. Enhancement is appropriate here to address Defendants willful infringement and conduct. Enhancement of damages by three times the jury verdict of $6,970,380.50 wou ld result in a total amount of $20,911,141.50. The Court enhances damages to the maximum extent allowable under § 284 given the totality of the circumstances. The Court, therefore, exercises its discretion, given the nature and circumstances particular to this case, and concludes it is appropriate to enhance the damages by trebling the jury award.Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/24/2016. (baf, )
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Strike Products Imperium Failed to Accuse in Its 029 Contentions from Imperiums Experts Report (Dkt. 135 ) is hereby DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants Motio n to Strike Portions of Dr. Cameron H.G. Wrights Rebuttal Report Concerning Validity Positions Not Previously Disclosed by Imperium (Dkt. 143 ) is hereby DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Leave to File Further Claim Construction Briefing (Dkt. 180 ) is hereby DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Expert Reports (Dkt. 186 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/22/2016. (baf, )
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 109 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions (Partially Opposed) filed by Imperium IP Holdings (Cayman), Ltd.. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/30/2016. (baf, )
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 107 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/28/2016. (baf, )
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 197 SEALED MOTION in Limine (Nos. 1-9) filed by Imperium IP Holdings (Cayman), Ltd., 198 SEALED MOTION Defendant Samsung's Motions In Limine filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/1/2016. (baf, )
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 125 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions to Add Samsung's Newly Released August 2015 Products filed by Imperium IP Holdings (Cayman), Ltd.. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/28/16. (cm, )
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 155 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Out-Of-Time filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Since leave was not granted, the Clerk is instructed to terminate Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that the Accused Samsung-Sony Products are Licensed (Dkt. #157) as an active motion. With trial rapidly approaching, the Court requests that th e parties each prepare, with consideration given to this order and the actions of the District Court of Delaware, a limited briefing (10 pages of briefing, not including exhibits) describing how issues related to the Sony License Agreement should affect the trial. These briefs shall be filed by noon on Thursday, January 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/21/2016. (baf, )
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 129 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel the Deposition Testimony of Alan M. Fisch filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/20/2016. (baf, )
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 171 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION -- Defendants' Opposed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Determination of Imperium's Breach of the Sony License by the District Court of Delaware -- filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/19/2016. (baf, )
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/16/2015. (baf, )
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Based on the foregoing, the Court finds that Defendants Samsung Techwin Co., Ltd. and Samsung Opto-Electronics America, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively to Sever the Proceedings 47 is hereby GRANTED IN PART a nd DENIED IN PART.The Court ORDERS that the claims pertaining to Defendants Samsung Techwin Co.,Ltd. and Samsung Opto-Electronics America, Inc. be SEVERED into a separate cause of action. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee for this case within ten (1 0) days of this order issuing to avoid having the severed cause of action dismissed with prejudice. Further, the Court ORDERS that the above-severed case be consolidated with the present case, Cause No. 4:14-cv-371, for all pre-trial issues excluding venue. The present case, Cause No. 4:14-cv-371, is the lead case, and all parties are instructed to file any future motions in the lead case. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/7/2015. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imperium IP Holdings (Cayman), Ltd. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imperium IP Holdings (Cayman), Ltd.
Represented By: Alan Michael Fisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Michael Fisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC
Represented By: Alan Michael Fisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Michael Fisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Techwin Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Opto-Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?