Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC v. Alixa Rx LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC
Defendant: Alixa Rx LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care
Case Number: 4:2015cv00766
Filed: November 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment and Award of Damages, Fees, and Interest (Dkt. # 395 ) is hereby GRANTED in part. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/8/2018. (rpc, )
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 386 MOTION for Attorney Fees . ORDERED that Tech Pharmacy's Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Dkt. #386) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff is awarded $7,304,454.15 in attorneys' fees. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/22/2017. (rpc, )
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 192 SEALED MOTION Tech Pharmacy's Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Improperly Clawed-Back Documents Previously Produced by a Non-Party filed by Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Tech Pharmacy Services, LLCs Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Improperly Clawed-Back Documents Previously Produced by a Non-Party (Dkt. #192) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/16/17. (cm, )
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 191 SEALED MOTION Motion For Relief Arising From Discovery Abuses During the Deposition of Defendants' Opinion Counsel David B. Walker filed by Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Tech Pharmacy Motion for Relief Arisingfrom Discovery Abuses Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 30(d)(2) (Dkt. #191) isGRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART.Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/11/17. (cm, )
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 184 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Keith R. Ugone on Disgorgement Damages filed by Golden Gate National Senior Care, Fillmore Strategic In vestors, LLC, Fillmore Strategic Management, LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC, Alixa Rx LLC. Defendants Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Keith R. Ugone on Disgorgement Damages (Dkt. #184) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/7/17. (cm, )
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 177 SEALED MOTION to Exclude and/or Strike Testimony of Defendants' Designated Expert Dr. Tim A. Williams filed by Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Tech Pharmacy Services, LLCs Motionto Exclude and/or Strike Testimony of Defendants Designated Expert Dr. Tim A. Williams (Dkt. #177) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/3/17. (cm, )
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 244 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement their Invalidity Contentions with Additional Information Concerning the Original Disclosed Envoy Prior Art filed by Golden Gate National Sen ior Care, Fillmore Strategic Investors, LLC, Fillmore Strategic Management, LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC, Alixa Rx LLC. Defendants Motion for Leave to Supplement Their Invalidity Contentions with Additional Information Concerning the Originally Disclosed Envoy Prior Art (Dkt. #244) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/2/17. (cm, )
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 218 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Non-Patent Claims Based on Running of the Applicable Statutes of Limitations filed by Golden Gate Nationa l Senior Care, Fillmore Strategic Investors, LLC, Fillmore Strategic Management, LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC, Alixa Rx LLC. Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs Non-Patent Claims Based On Running of the Applicable Statutes of Limitations (Dkt. #218) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/25/17. (cm, )
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 220 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Patent Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 102(b) (on-Sale Bar Affirmative Defense) filed by Golden Gate National Senior Care, Fi llmore Strategic Investors, LLC, Fillmore Strategic Management, LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC, Alixa Rx LLC. Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Patent Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(b) (Dkt. #220) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/24/17. (cm, )
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING re 158 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate's Order on Motion for Leave to Supplement P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions (ECF. No. 146) filed by Golden Gate National Senior Care, Fillmore Strategic Investors, LLC, Fillmore Strategic Management, LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC, Alixa Rx LLC. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/10/17. (cm, )
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 92 MOTION to Dismiss The Fillmore Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Tech Pharmacy Services, LLCs Motion to Dismiss the Fillmore Defendants Counterclaims (Dkt. #92) is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/8/16. (cm, )
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/28/2016. (pad, )
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 68 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order filed by Golden Gate National Senior Care, Alixa Rx LLC. The Court finds is Defendants Motion for Protective Order (Dkt. #68) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/17/16. (cm, )
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 26 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC, 23 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Golden Gate National Seni or Care, Alixa Rx LLC. Defendants Alixa Rx LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care LLCs Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. #23) is hereby DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. #26) is, therefore, DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/15/16. (cm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC v. Alixa Rx LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alixa Rx LLC
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate National Senior Care
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?